+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2017 H.J. 559
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 562
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 479
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 453
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 409
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 327
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 313
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 296
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 286
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 242
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 96
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2017: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2017: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 6, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor