+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 716
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 600
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 574
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 558
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 538
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 518
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 486
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 194
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 170
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 115
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 39
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House H.J. 34
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2015: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2015: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor