+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 458
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 405
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 295
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 373
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 273
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 253
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 234
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 208
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 167
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 203
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 158
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1056ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 57
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2016: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
January 25, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (101)
Type:
Primary Sponsor