+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 18, 2020 H.J. 294
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 233
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 275
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 190
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 121
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 86
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 86 Amendment 1055B
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 51
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. Amendment 1055A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Local Government H.J. 27
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 11