+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 770
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 749
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 629
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 672
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 648
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 521
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 501
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 491
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 428
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1054jk
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 242
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate S.J. 114
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 7. H.J. 84
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 84 Amendment 1054jd
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 84 Amendment 1054je
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 83 Amendment 1054sa
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 52
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1054jb
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1054ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 26
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2014: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
February 24, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 23, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 7
January 17, 2014: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2014: Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor