+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 H.J. 418
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 H.J. 347
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 297
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 244
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 233
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3.
- Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2.
- Local Government Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 157
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 22. H.J. 183
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Local Government H.J. 58
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 11