+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 738
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 644
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 613
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 601
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 566
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 544
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 355
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 10. H.J. 352
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 321
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 39
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House H.J. 31
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2015: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2015: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 9, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor