+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 708
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 615
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 548
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 559
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 485
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 463
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 157
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 162
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 72
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 24
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 16, 2012: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
January 23, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor