+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 358
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 316
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 340
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 259
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 175
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 231
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 220
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 27
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 11