+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 880
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 845
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 577
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 807
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 530
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate & referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 489
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 715
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. H.J. 696
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 62
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 36
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 23
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
February 25, 2016: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor