+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 348
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 331
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 333
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 293
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 295
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 274
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 134
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 86
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 73
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 28
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2013: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2013: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
January 16, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor