+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 438
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 404
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 423
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 359
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 365
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 346
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 215
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 5. H.J. 178
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 134
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 96
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2011: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 25, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor