+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2020 H.J. 265
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 192
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 249
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 158
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 99
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 62
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 27
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 11