+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor H.J. 318
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 283
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 242
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 257
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 213
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from Consent Calendar S.J. 202
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent,
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 143
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 15. H.J. 158
- Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 157 Amendment 1037A
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 11
+ − Votes (4)
February 8, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 213
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 15. H.J. 158
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
January 27, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1