+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2018 H.J. 366
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 394
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 334
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 284
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 159
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 96
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. Amendment 1027ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 22
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 1, 2018: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
January 31, 2018: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
January 18, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
January 16, 2018: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
January 16, 2018: Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor