+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor H.J. 293
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 270
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 229
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 247
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 124
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 130
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent,
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 16
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
February 4, 2021: Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 130
- Yeas: 70
January 25, 2021: Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1