+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 488
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 454
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 457
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 404
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 416
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 394
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 201
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 152
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 124
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 25
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2011: Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
January 24, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Retirement Laws
Type:
Primary Sponsor