+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 H.J. 364
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2017 H.J. 337
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 318
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 297
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 280
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 246
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 183
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 167
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 100
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 84
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 20
+ − Votes (3)
February 2, 2017: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2017: Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
January 23, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
+ − Sponsor
Retirement Laws
Type:
Primary Sponsor