+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 528
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 505
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 491
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 455
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 433
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 411
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 295
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 249
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 190
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 24
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
February 14, 2011: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor