+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2019 H.J. 304
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2019 H.J. 276
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 220
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 241
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 202
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 179
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 122
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 131
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 66
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 19
+ − Votes (3)
January 28, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
January 25, 2019: Taxation Do Pass, Passed
January 16, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor