+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 421
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 458
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 388
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 238
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 7. H.J. 281
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 271
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 19
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 11