+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor H.J. 570
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 530
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 445
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 502
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to, Passed S.J. 349
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 225
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 243
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1013A
- Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 15
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403
- Yeas: 35
March 2, 2021: Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2021: Referred to, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 7
February 8, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 243
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1