+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Veto override, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 630
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Veto override, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 570
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor on March 12, 2020 H.J. 608
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 421
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 458
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 175
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 231
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012D
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012A
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012B
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012E
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012F
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012H
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012I
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 19
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 11