+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 806
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Veto override, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 29. H.J. 775
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor H.J. 748
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 650
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 398
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 427
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 311
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 291
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 167
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 203
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 202 Amendment 1008cb
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 158
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1008ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 35
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 16
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2016: Veto override, Failed
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 5
February 16, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
February 11, 2016: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
January 25, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor