+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 454
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 349
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 286
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 307
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 249
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 226
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 135
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 8. H.J. 77
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 50
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 15
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 5
January 31, 2012: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6