+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 290
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/26/16
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 209
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Govan
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: King, Felder, McCoy, Stavrinakis, Bannister, Hamilton, Henderson, Anthony
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Collins
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
April 12, 2016: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor