+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Harrell, Williams
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Murphy, Willis
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 3, 2014: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor