+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations
- Polled out of committee Invitations
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Invitations
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations
- Polled out of committee Invitations
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations
- Introduced
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor