+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-2
- Read second time
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. R. Williams, Jefferson, Brawley, Cobb-Hunter, Henderson-Myers, S. Williams, Moore, Ridgeway, Wheeler, Alexander, Thigpen, Rose, King, Dilliard, Robinson
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Vote
March 6, 2019: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 30
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor