+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor