+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (66)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 40
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden Ayes-32 Nays-12
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-95 Nays-18
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Ratified R 51
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-20
- Free conference report adopted
- Free conference committee appointed Simrill, Rutherford, White
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-16
- Free conference powers granted
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-11
- Free conference powers granted
- Free conference committee appointed Sheheen, Campbell, Turner
- Free conference report adopted
- Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-12
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Simrill, Rutherford, White
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Campbell, Sheheen, Turner
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-7 Nays-107
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-9
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
- Amended
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
- Roll call Ayes-21 Nays-17
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-23 Nays-18
- Motion For Special Order Failed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-18
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-1-17
- Member request name added as sponsor: Sottile
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-28-17
- Member request name added as sponsor: King
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hardee, Weeks
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Davis, B.Newton, Anthony, Crosby, S.Rivers, Thigpen, Hosey, Murphy
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Ways and Means
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clyburn
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith, Clemmons
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder, Bernstein
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Brown, Whipper, Cobb-Hunter
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Martin, Spires, Funderburk, D.C.Moss
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henderson
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Ridgeway, Williams, Jefferson, Ott, Govan
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Douglas, Knight, Erickson
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (38)
May 10, 2017: Overide Veto by the Governor
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
May 10, 2017: To override the veto
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Adopt Free Conference Report
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Grant Free Conference Powers
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
May 8, 2017: Motion to invoke cloture
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2017: To adopt the free conference report
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2017: To grant free conference powers
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 3, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 107
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
April 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 56
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 48
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 54
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 55
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 58
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 62
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 35
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 40
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 50
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 53
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: To adopt Amendment number 71
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2017: Rule 15A
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table- -Part A Amendment number 33
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 36A
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 42
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 8A
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 9D
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 26
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 31
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number P1-4A
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 2B
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2017: Adoption of committee amendment
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 7
April 19, 2017: To adopt Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
March 29, 2017: To set for Special Order
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2017: Adopt Amendment number 19
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 84
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2017: Table Amendment number 18
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2017: Table Amendment number 9
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor