+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 116
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 10/01/13
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 10
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2013: Adopt Resolution
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor