+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 7, 2017: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 4