+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor