+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 117
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/01/13
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 6
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
- Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 6
January 22, 2013: Adopt Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 32
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor