+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed. 9-23-20
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-17-20
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Bradley
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Martin, Magnuson, Burns, Chumley, Long, Fry, Bennett, Mace, Kimmons
- Requests for debate-Rep. G.R. Smith, Martin, Trantham, Magnuson, Burns, Chumley, Long, Fry, Hill, Jones, Bennett, Mace, Kimmons
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 26, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor