+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 272
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/17/18
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 231
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-3
- Read second time
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 8
April 26, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1