+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 119
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 84
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
- Introduced and read first time
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2017: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 10
March 9, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3