+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 302
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/23/16
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became law without Governor's signature
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 187
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on General
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General
- Introduced and read first time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2016: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 6