+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Transportation
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-10-19
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 4