+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 112
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 04/01/15
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became law without Governor's signature
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 13
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1
- Read second time
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 3