+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-9-17
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
- Introduced and read first time
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Vote
February 1, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 7