+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 95
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/09/15
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 2
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2015: Passage of Joint Resolution
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 8
January 28, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor