+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 42
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 63
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with amendments
- Roll call Ayes-31 Nays-0
- House amendment amended
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
- Amended
- Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-2
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (4)
May 11, 2017: To adopt Amendment number RFH-2
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 14
May 11, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 6
May 4, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 8
March 23, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor