+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 90
- Effective date 07/09/15
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 132
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-20
- Read third time and enrolled
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-27
- Read second time
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-3
- Read third time and sent to House
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-3
- Read second time
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (27)
July 9, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3
July 9, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 3
July 9, 2015: Table reconsideration motion
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
July 9, 2015: Adopt Amendment
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
July 9, 2015: Table Amendment number 68
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 60
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
July 9, 2015: Table Amendment number 56
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 59
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 56
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table motion to reconsider Amd. 59 Amendment number 59
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 57
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Adopt Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 90
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 28
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 29
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 30
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 33
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 61
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 63
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 65
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table Motion to Divide the Question Amendment number 66
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 53
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 66
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
July 8, 2015: Table Amendment number 56
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
July 8, 2015: Adjourn For The Day
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 111
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
July 7, 2015: Table motion to recall from judiciary
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 91
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
July 7, 2015: Motion to recall from judiciary
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
July 7, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
July 6, 2015: To lay on the table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
July 6, 2015: To lay on the table Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
July 6, 2015: To lay on the table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
July 6, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor