+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor