+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 197
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/15/18
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 215
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Brawley, Brown, Pendarvis, Hosey, King
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Kirby
- Requests for debate-Rep. Williams, King, Brawley, Pendarvis, Kirby, Hosey, Brown, Gilliard
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 24
- Absent: 6
March 14, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor