+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen , Hembree, McElveen
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled