+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 163
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/16/14
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 175
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Bennett , Shealy, Kimpson
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 5
March 26, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor