+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 1, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2